WV HB3353 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to limit state agencies from forming financial relationships that will benefit foreign entities that have values antithetical to those of the State of West Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the limitations on the financial relationships with foreign entities that have values antithetical to those of the State of West Virginia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 222) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 204) (Y: 20 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 203) (Y: 19 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-24SenateTo Government Organization
2023-02-24SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2023-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-23HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-23HousePassed House (Roll No. 222)
2023-02-23HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-23HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-22HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-02-22HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 204)
2023-02-22HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 203)
2023-02-22HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-22HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2023-02-22HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2023-02-21HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-20HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/21
2023-02-20HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-17HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-16House2nd reference dispensed
2023-02-16HouseHouse further considered bill
2023-02-16HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-16HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2023-02-08HouseTo House Government Organization
2023-02-08HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-08HouseTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2023-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31156DNew CodeSee Bill Text
5A33DNew CodeSee Bill Text
5F22Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3353&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3353%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3353
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3353%20eng.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=3353
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20fluharty%20et%20al%202-20.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20pushkin%202-20.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20mcgeehan%202-21%20_1%20revised.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20mcgeehan%202-21%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20mcgeehan%202-21%20_1%20revised%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20fluharty%20et%20al%202-20%20rejected.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/hb3353%20hfa%20pushkin%202-20%20rejected.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=861798497
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=861798473
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00203.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00204.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00222.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback