WV HB335 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - On 3rd reading with right to amend
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require covered employers to provide for certain exemptions from mandatory COVID-19 vaccinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to COVID-19 immunizations requirements for employment in the public and private sectors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 835) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 834) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Motion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 833) (Y: 10 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-14 - House - Constitutional Rule Suspension Rejected (Roll No. 824) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-13 - House - Motion bill be committed to Health and Human Resources committee rejected (Roll No. 762) (Y: 23 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2021-10-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-18SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-10-15SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-15SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-15SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-10-15HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 835)
2021-10-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 834)
2021-10-15HouseMotion for previous question rejected (Roll No. 833)
2021-10-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-14HouseConstitutional Rule Suspension Rejected (Roll No. 824)
2021-10-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-13HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-13HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-13HouseMotion bill be committed to Health and Human Resources committee rejected (Roll No. 762)
2021-10-13HouseDo pass
2021-10-13HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-10-13HouseIntroduced in House
2021-10-13HouseTo Government Organization
2021-10-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB3035 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback