WV HB3331 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to allow the Supreme Court of Appeals greater flexibility to efficiently staff the family courts and magistrate courts of this state by eliminating certain statutory restrictions on the number and ratio of existing staff, and authorizing the creation of additional classifications of support staff at or below statutorily established salary levels for other support staff. The bill also removes outdated language regarding staff pay to reflect current levels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to support staff in the family courts and magistrate courts of this state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 346) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2023-03-01SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2023-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 346)
2023-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-27HouseAmendment ruled not germane
2023-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-25HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-25HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-24HouseDo pass
2023-02-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2023-02-08HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-08HouseTo Judiciary
2023-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5018Amended CodeCitation Text
5019Amended CodeCitation Text
5019aAmended CodeCitation Text
5019CNew CodeSee Bill Text
512A6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback