WV HB3312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Workforce
Pending: Senate Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Workforce
Pending: Senate Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a memorial to child labor and child workers who died in the course of employment in this state
Title
Establishing a memorial to child labor and child workers who died in the course of employment in this state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 385) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Workforce |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Workforce then Finance |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 385) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-26 | House | Originating in House Government Organization |
Same As/Similar To
HB3312 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - To Workforce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 3A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 3A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |