WV HB3311 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the alcohol limit on table wine from 14% to 15% to be comparable to beer as otherwise provided for in the code.
Title
Relating to wine alcohol by volume as compared to beer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 528) (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 143) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 143) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 528) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 143) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-07 | House | To Government Organization |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 8 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |