WV HB3310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the jurisdiction of the Public Service Commission
Title
Relating to the jurisdiction of the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 583) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 383) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 383) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 111, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Became law 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 583) |
2021-04-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 582) |
2021-04-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 393) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 383) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-26 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 1 | 1c | New Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |