WV HB3307 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Social Media Intergrity and Anti-Corruption in Elections Act
Title
Social Media Integrity and Anti-Corruption in Elections Act
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Del. Riley Keaton [R] | Del. Dana Ferrell [R] | Del. Josh Holstein [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 381) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 381) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Originating in House Technology and Infrastructure |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 12a | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 7 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |