WV HB3293 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish requirements for the state educational agency and local educational agencies to support students in the public school system who exhibit indicators of risk for, or who have been diagnosed with, dyslexia and dyscalculia.
Title
Relating generally to identifying and educating exceptional children exhibiting indicators or diagnosed with dyslexia or dyscalculia
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Kathie Crouse [R] |
Del. Wayne Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 179) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-17 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 179) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-03 | House | To House Education |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-03 | House | To Education |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3462 (Similar To) 2023-02-14 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |