WV HB3281 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to help improve the technology infrastructure of the West Virginia Secretary of State's Office.
Title
Improving the technology infrastructure of the West Virginia Secretary of State's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | By substitute, do pass | |
2009-03-24 | To House Finance | |
2009-03-24 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2009-03-23 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-23 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2009-03-23 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB693 (Same As) 2010-02-22 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3281&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |