WV HB3268 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - To Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - To Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add protections for West Virginia residents who reside out of state for certain time periods from non-renewal of licenses and registration.
Title
Add protections for WV residents who reside out of state for certain time periods from non-renewal of licenses and registration
Sponsors
Del. Trenton Barnhart [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Charlie Reynolds [R] |
Del. Dana Ferrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 123) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 122) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-13 | House | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 123) |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 122) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-08 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-03 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-03 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 62 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |