WV HB3268 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to who may claim a homestead exemption
Title
Relating to who may claim a homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | To Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House Message received | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 170) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Originating in House Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 6B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 6B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |