WV HB3233 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 286, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 286, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize an increase to the officer uniform allowance and to create a maternity and specialty uniform allowance. This bill was recommended for introduction during the 2023 regular session of the Legislature by the Adjutant General.
Title
Relating generally to uniform and equipment allowances for the National Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 586) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 434) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 201) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 434) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 201) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 286, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 586) |
2023-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 434) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2023-02-23 | Senate | To Military |
2023-02-23 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 201) |
2023-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-22 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-09 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-09 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-02 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-02 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3452 (Similar To) 2023-02-14 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1B | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |