WV HB3225 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add to the definition of harassment, intimidation or bullying. The bill requires a child to attend two months of counseling provided by a school if he or she is found to be harassing, intimidating or bullying a fellow student. The bill provides for consequences for failure to comply with the counseling requirement.
Title
Expanding the definition of harassment, intimidation or bullying
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Brady Paxton [D] | Del. David Perry [D] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Linda Phillips [D] | Del. Mary Poling [D] | Del. Stan Shaver [D] |
Del. Margaret Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 18, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 431) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 67) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 66) | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2011-03-09 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/8/11 | |
2011-03-08 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To Education | |
2011-03-03 | To Education then Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 229) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | Amended on 3rd reading | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-22 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | To House Education | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-21 | To Education then Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 2C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |