WV HB3220 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB3220
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Restrictions on Taxpayer funded lobbying
Title
Restrictions on Taxpayer funded lobbying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 179) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 178) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 103) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 103) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 35) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 178) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 103) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 103) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 35) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/2/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/2/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Governor 2/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/24/22 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-21 | House | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 179) |
2022-02-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 178) |
2022-02-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 103) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 103) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 35) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3220 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6B | 3 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |