WV HB3199 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to not require a report for the termination of ectopic pregnancy.
Title
Relating to removing the requirement that an ectopic pregnancy be reported
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 624) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 138) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 137) (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) (Y: 33 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 624) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 138) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 137) (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) (Y: 33 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 269, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Became law 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 624) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 624) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 138) |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 137) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 126) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/13/23 |
2023-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-08 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-02 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-02 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |