WV HB3188 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish an alert system for missing cognitively impaired persons. The bill provides for the use of video image recording devices for search purposes during a Purple Alert. The bill provides for legislative findings. The bill sets forth criteria for the activation of a Purple Alert. The bill provides for notice and broadcasting of a Purple Alert. Finally, the bill provides immunity for individuals providing information pursuant to a Purple Alert in good faith.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an alert system for missing cognitively impaired persons
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Kayla Young [D] |
Del. Jordan Maynor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 411) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 238) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 411) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 238) |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-31 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |