WV HB3175 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to removing certain felonies than can prohibit vehicle salespersons from receiving a license
Title
Relating to removing certain felonies than can prohibit vehicle salespersons from receiving a license
Sponsors
Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] | Del. Moore Capito [R] | Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] |
Del. Jonathan Pinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 489) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 328) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 328) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 208) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 207) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 489) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 328) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 328) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 208) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 207) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 489) |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 328) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 328) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 208) |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 207) |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 6E | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17A | 6E | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |