WV HB3168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 321, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 321, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modernize the TDA to account for issues in global supply chains, labor markets, and other issues resulting in delays in construction in the future to ensure investment in WV Tourism is competitive with other states and accessible long term.
Title
Ensuring investment in WV Tourism is competitive with other states and accessible long term
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 464) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 321, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 464) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-03-01 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 173) |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-01-31 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-31 | House | To Economic Development and Tourism then Finance |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2E | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2E | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 2E | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |