WV HB3156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase compensation rates for panel attorneys and investigators, and to provide indigent defendants with an opportunity to obtain expungements.
Title
Raising the compensation rates of panel attorneys
Sponsors
Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. William Nestor [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Todd Kirby [R] |
Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. Chris Pritt [R] | Del. Caleb Hanna [R] | Del. Josh Holstein [R] |
Del. Mark Dean [R] | Del. Andy Shamblin [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 726) (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 463) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 463) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 342) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/27/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 726) |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Finance committee title amendment adopted |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Judiciary committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 463) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Finance committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance |
2023-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 342) |
2023-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-30 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 21 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |