WV HB315 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Department of Veterans Assistance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Department of Veterans Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2021-10-15HousePlaced on House Calendar
2021-10-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-14HousePostponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 10/15/21
2021-10-14HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-12HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-12HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-12HouseDo pass
2021-10-11HouseTo House Finance
2021-10-11HouseIntroduced in House
2021-10-11HouseTo Finance
2021-10-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB3013 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - To Governor 10/18/21

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback