WV HB3149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3149
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to manufacturing and producing hard cider in West Virginia
Title
Relating to manufacturing and producing hard cider in West Virginia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 391) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 391) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB3149 (Carry Over) 2019-03-01 - To Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |