WV HB3128 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Communicated to House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to carrier fees on 911 fee revenues
Title
Relating to carrier fees on 911 fee revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 480) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 182) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 480) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Finance Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Government Organization Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-04-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-18 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 182) |
2021-03-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-12 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |