WV HB3126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require a railroad company to provide pesticide safety information at a central location accessible to employees of the railroad company and to the public and local communities along the right-of-way treated by pesticide use. The bill also requires a railroad company to provide pesticide safety training annually to its employees who work along railroad rights,of,way and in rail yards. This section is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Requiring a railroad company to provide pesticide safety information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 148, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal | |
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 422) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 21) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment | |
2011-03-01 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House Message received | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 167) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-02-23 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-15 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-15 | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for introduction |