WV HB3113 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require each high school student to complete a one credit course of study in personal finance as a requirement for high school graduation.
Title
Requiring high school students to complete course of study in personal finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 356) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 405) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 136) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 405) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 136) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 141, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/13/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 356) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 405) |
2023-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 279) |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Education |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 136) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-27 | House | To House Education |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-27 | House | To Education |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2242 (Similar To) 2023-01-11 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 7c | Amended Code | Citation Text |