WV HB3107 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 280, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring that Post Traumatic Stress Disorder diagnosed by a licensed psychiatrist is a compensable occupational disease for first responders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring that Post Traumatic Stress Disorder diagnosed by a licensed psychiatrist is a compensable occupational disease for first responders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 657) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 656) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 278) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 280, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-21HouseApproved by Governor 4/21/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal
2021-04-21HouseTo Governor 4/21/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 657)
2021-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 656)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-10SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 486)
2021-04-10SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 486)
2021-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2021-04-10SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-08SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 4/8/21
2021-04-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-07SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-07SenateOn 1st reading
2021-04-06SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2021-03-26SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2021-03-26SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2021-03-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 278)
2021-03-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-24HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-03-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-23HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/24/21
2021-03-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-22HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-19HouseDo pass
2021-03-18HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-03-18HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2021-03-12HouseTo House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
2021-03-12HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-12HouseTo Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary
2021-03-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB627 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - To Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2341fAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3107&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3107%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=3107
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3107%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=3107
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3107%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=3107
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB3107%20HFA%20CAPITO%203-24%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB3107%20S%20H_HR%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB3107%20SFA%20_1%20MARONEY%204-8%20pulled.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB3107%20SFA%20_2%20MARONEY%204-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB3107%20SFAT%20_1%20MARONEY%204-8.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB3107%20S%20H_HR%20AM%20_1%20as%20am.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00278.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0486.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00656.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00657.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback