WV HB3103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow a distillery or mini-distillery to offer liquor for retail sale and consumption on or off the premises if a licensed Class A private club is operating on the premises.
Title
Authorizing operators of a distillery or mini-distillery to offer for purchase and consumption liquor on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 4 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |