WV HB3101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for medical guidelines and information related to breast density.
Title
Relating to notification of breast density
Sponsors
Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Laura Kimble [R] | Del. Debbie Warner [R] | Del. Kathie Crouse [R] |
Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Lori Dittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 185) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 185) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |