WV HB3089 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Make utility workers essential employees during a state of emergency
Title
Make utility workers essential employees during a state of emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 670) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 669) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 668) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 364) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 669) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 668) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 364) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 670) |
2021-04-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 669) |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 668) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 471) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 364) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | House | To House Workforce Development |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-12 | House | To Workforce Development then Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 5 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |