WV HB3074 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information on organ and tissue donations
Title
Relating to information on organ and tissue donations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 363) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Education |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Education |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 363) |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-11 | House | To House Education |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-11 | House | To Education |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed for introduction |