WV HB3064 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 23, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 23, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is for the Legislature to find and declare the existence of a moral obligation to pay, with public moneys, each of the claims herein against specified state agencies and the State of West Virginia, by the named claimants, payable from the specified funds, and in the amounts of the awards made. A second and separate bill (either supplementary appropriation bill or a section of the budget bill) will actually appropriate the moneys herein awarded and permit payment in current fiscal year 2011 and through 2012. The totals, as to type of funds and amounts of awards in the bill, are: (1) General Revenue Funds of $5,957,941.63 (2) Special Revenue Funds of $70,428.87 (3) State Road Funds of $2,389,259.77
Title
Finding and declaring certain claims against the state and its agencies to be moral obligations of the state
Sponsors
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Allen Evans [R] | Del. Richard Iaquinta [D] | Del. Timothy Manchin [D] |
Del. Charlene Marshall [D] | Del. Josh Stowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 23, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/18/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/18/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/18/11 | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 | |
2011-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-10 | House Message received | |
2011-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 262) | |
2011-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 261) | |
2011-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) | |
2011-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) | |
2011-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-04 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2011-03-01 | To Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House Message received | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 162) | |
2011-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 161) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-08 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-08 | To Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Same As) 2011-02-09 - To Finance