WV HB3044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Commissioner of Highways to develop a formula for allocating road funds among districts, for the benefit of the counties; to make legislative findings; to require the commissioner to solicit and consider public comments; to require the commissioner to consider certain factors when developing the formula; and to require the commissioner to submit the formula to the Legislature for approval as a legislative rule.
Title
Requiring the Commissioner of Highways to develop a formula for allocating road funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 551) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 738) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 480) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 738) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 480) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 551) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 738) |
2019-03-09 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Clements, Swope, Beach |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 480) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 338) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 30 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 30 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |