WV HB304 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-13 - On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To promote family health
Title
To promote family health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-09-13 | House | Amendment pending |
2022-07-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-07-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-07-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-07-28 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-07-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-07-27 | House | To House Finance |
2022-07-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-07-27 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5K | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 4x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ww | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8x | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 11 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 7h | New Code | See Bill Text |