WV HB3039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB3039

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to expand the court’s consideration of the expression of a preference by children in certain child custody matters by removing language giving priority to preferences of 14-year-old children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a court's consideration of the expression of a preference by a child in certain child custody matters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 3) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 3)
2020-01-15HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-13HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-10HouseDo pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3039 (Carry Over) 2019-02-22 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
489206Amended CodeCitation Text
489402Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback