WV HB3036 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB3036
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sunsetting the Board of Sanitarians
Title
Sunsetting the Board of Sanitarians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 92) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 92) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3036 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - To Health and Human Resources