WV HB3030 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that appeals to the Supreme Court are a matter of right and that every party has an opportunity to be heard. The bill sets forth exceptions.
Title
Relating to appeals as a matter of right in the West Virginia Supreme Court of Appeals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 466) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 466) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 135) |
2017-03-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-17 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |