WV HB3019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - On 2nd reading to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring official business and records of the state and its political subdivisions be conducted in English
Title
Requiring official business and records of the state and its political subdivisions be conducted in English
Sponsors
Del. Lynwood Ireland [R] | Del. John Overington [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. Dana Lynch [D] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] |
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 366) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/6/15 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2015-03-06 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 366) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-28 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |