WV HB3018 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the allowable range of difference in salary potential of school employees in different counties
Title
Increasing the allowable range of difference in salary potential of school employees in different counties
Sponsors
Del. Amanda Pasdon [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. Walter Duke [R] |
Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Brian Kurcaba [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/4/15 |
2015-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-27 | House | Originating in House Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |