WV HB3013 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the creation of an EODD within Jefferson County and to authorize Jefferson County to levy a special district excise tax for the benefit of the development district.
Title
Relating to authorizing the Jefferson County Commission to levy a special district excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 532) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 531) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 363) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 264) (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 531) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 363) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 264) (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 88, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 532) |
2023-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 531) |
2023-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 375) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate reconsidered effective date |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 363) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 1st reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 265) |
2023-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 264) |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-23 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-01-25 | House | To House Finance |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-25 | House | To Finance |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 22 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |