WV HB301 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reducing the personal income tax
Title
Relating to reducing the personal income tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 759) (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-07-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 758) (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-07-28 - House - Motion to refer bill to committee on Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 757) (Y: 10 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 756) (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 755) (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Motion to postpone rejected (Roll No. 754) (Y: 4 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-27 - House - advanced to 3rd reading with amendments pending and right to amend adopted (Roll No. 753) (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-07-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 758) (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-07-28 - House - Motion to refer bill to committee on Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 757) (Y: 10 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 756) (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 755) (Y: 16 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-28 - House - Motion to postpone rejected (Roll No. 754) (Y: 4 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2022-07-27 - House - advanced to 3rd reading with amendments pending and right to amend adopted (Roll No. 753) (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-07-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 759) |
2022-07-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 758) |
2022-07-28 | House | Motion to refer bill to committee on Government Organization rejected (Roll No. 757) |
2022-07-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 756) |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 755) |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-28 | House | Motion to postpone rejected (Roll No. 754) |
2022-07-28 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-07-27 | House | Amendments pending |
2022-07-27 | House | advanced to 3rd reading with amendments pending and right to amend adopted (Roll No. 753) |
2022-07-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-07-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-07-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-07-26 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-07-26 | House | Do pass |
2022-07-25 | House | To House Finance |
2022-07-25 | House | To Finance |
2022-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3001 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Communicated to Senate