WV HB301 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reapportioning House of Delegates Districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reapportioning House of Delegates Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 44) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 43) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 757) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 756) (Y: 20 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 755) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 754) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 753) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-13 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 752) (Y: 25 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18SenateSenate requests House to concur in changed effective date
2021-10-18SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 44)
2021-10-18SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 44)
2021-10-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-18SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 43)
2021-10-18SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-18SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-18SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-10-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 757)
2021-10-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Voice vote)
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 756)
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 755)
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 754)
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 753)
2021-10-13HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 752)
2021-10-13HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2021-10-12HouseAmendments pending
2021-10-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-11HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-11HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-11HouseDo pass
2021-10-11HouseOriginating in House Select Committee on Redistricting

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=301&year=2021&sessiontype=3X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB301%20ORG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=301
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00752.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00753.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00754.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00755.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00756.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00757.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/senate/10-18-0043.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/senate/10-18-0044.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback