WV HB3005 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB3005

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of unmanned aircraft systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of unmanned aircraft systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 355) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 308) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 15) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseChapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/16/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/16/18 - House Journal
2018-03-16HouseTo Governor 3/16/18
2018-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 355)
2018-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-03SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 308)
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-03SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-02SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-01SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-28SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2018-01-26SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-26SenateTo Judiciary
2018-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-26SenateHouse Message received
2018-01-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-01-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 15)
2018-01-25HouseMotion to table bill rejected
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-25HouseAmended on 3rd reading
2018-01-25HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2018-01-25HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-24HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2018-01-23HouseRead 1st time
2018-01-23HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2018-01-22HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-01-10HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-10HouseTo Judiciary
2018-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3005 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61141New CodeSee Bill Text
61142New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3005&year=2018&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb3005%20intr.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=3005
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3005%20SUB.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=3005
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3005%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=3005
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB3005%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=3005
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-03-0308.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00355.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback