WV HB3004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require vacancies in offices of state officials, United States Senators, Justices, judges, and magistrates to be filled with an individual of the same political party with which the individual vacating the office was affiliated at the time of his or her election to the vacated office.
Title
Relating to filling vacancies in certain offices
Sponsors
Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Pat McGeehan [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Effective date rejected (Roll No. 270) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 269) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 141) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 14) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 269) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 141) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 14) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 80, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | Became law without Governor's signature |
2018-03-10 | House | Became law without Governor's signature- House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Became law without Governor's signature - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/3/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/3/18 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/3/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-01 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Effective date rejected (Roll No. 270) |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 269) |
2018-03-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 141) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 14) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, House Calendar |
2018-01-24 | House | Amendment pending |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |