WV HB2995 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2995

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit certain animal euthanasia technicians who have been certified by other states be certified animal euthanasia technicians in West Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting certain animal euthanasia technicians who have been certified by other states be certified animal euthanasia technicians in West Virginia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 489) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 493) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 96) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseChapter 180, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-21HouseApproved by Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal
2018-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/18
2018-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-10SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-10SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-10SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 489)
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 493)
2018-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2018-03-08SenateConference report filed - Senate
2018-03-08HouseConference report filed - House
2018-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-06HouseTo conference
2018-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-06HouseHouse appointed conferees: Hamrick, Sypolt, Lynch
2018-03-06HouseHouse agreed to conference
2018-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-06SenateSenate appoints conference committee: Smith, Maynard, Baldwin
2018-03-06SenateSenate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote)
2018-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-05HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2018-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 346)
2018-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-03SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-02SenateOn 1st reading
2018-03-01SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2018-02-15SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-15SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-15SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-14HousePassed House (Roll No. 96)
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-13HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-13HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-12HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-12HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-09HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-01-24HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-01-24HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2018-01-10HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-01-10HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-10HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization
2018-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2995 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301012Amended CodeCitation Text
30103Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback