WV HB2983 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2983
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting priority to roadway construction, reconstruction and maintenance for roadways prone to recurring floods that hinder ingress and egress
Title
Granting priority to roadway construction, reconstruction and maintenance for roadways prone to recurring floods that hinder ingress and egress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 307) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 307) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 204) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-06 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2983 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 2A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |