WV HB2981 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing veterans with suicide prevention assistance
Title
Providing veterans with suicide prevention assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 299) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Military |
2021-03-27 | Senate | To Military |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 299) |
2021-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-18 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-08 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-08 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2981 (Carry Over) 2021-03-27 - To Military
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9A | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |