WV HB2975 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to include employees and contract employees of a day report center to those prohibited from engaging in sexual acts with those persons under their supervision.
Title
Relating to imposition of sexual acts on persons incarcerated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 557) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 333) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 333) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 557) |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 333) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 216) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8B | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |