WV HB2972 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2972
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Title
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Sponsors
Del. Doug Smith [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Mark Zatezalo [R] |
Del. Carl Martin [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Mike Pushkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 29) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 29) |
2022-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-01-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-01-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-01-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2972 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary