WV HB2972 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2972
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Title
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 165) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 164) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 164) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 165) |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 164) |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2972 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - To Judiciary