WV HB2969 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the procedures for the sale and operation of a municipally owned toll bridge by a private toll transportation facility
Title
To clarify the procedures for the sale and operation of a municipally owned toll bridge by a private toll transportation facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 507) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 354) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 163) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 162) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 507) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 354) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 163) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 162) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 507) |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 354) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Floor Title amendment adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 353) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 163) |
2021-03-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 162) |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-08 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 16D | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 16D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17A | 2A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 2A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |