WV HB2968 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enact enabling legislation for the "Nonprofit Youth Organization Tax Exemption Support Amendment" to Article X of the Constitution of the State of West Virginia passed by the voters of the state at the general election of November 4, 2014. The bill exempts from property tax certain properties in this state owned by nonprofit youth organizations and built at cost of at least $100 million. The bill sets forth the restrictions that affect the property. The bill sets forth the permitted activities. The bill requires the property owner to pay four percent of the net revenues. The bill establishes how that four percent is to be allocated. The bill requires reports and defines terms.
Title
Exempting from property tax certain properties in this state owned by nonprofit youth organizations
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. David Perry [D] |
Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. John Shott [R] |
Del. John McCuskey [R] | Sen. Karen Arvon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 501) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 227, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 501) |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 347) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendments pending |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-24 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 3 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |